This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 12/09/2022 at 02:59:35 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V MARY A HOWARD

Case Summary

On 02/01/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARY A HOWARD. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Cleveland, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SINGLETON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-32

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SINGLETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L V N V FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HOWARD, MARY ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIPPETT, DONALD CLAYTON

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

02/01/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/01/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

WAIVER

04/26/2022: WAIVER

JUDGMENT-CONSENT

05/10/2022: JUDGMENT-CONSENT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/19/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; Entry: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARY A HOWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-CONSENT; Name: 13TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 6,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: NON-TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: TIPPETT, DONALD CLAYTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: TIPPETT, DONALD CLAYTON; Entry: waiver of service & entry of appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: MARY A HOWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less