This case was last updated from Saline County Courts on 05/25/2022 at 08:48:35 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V DIANNE DOLAN -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against DIANNE DOLAN -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Saline County Courts, Saline County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is Houston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-81

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Saline, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

Houston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

DOLAN, DIANNE

Benton, AR 72019-7590

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUELLER, DAVID

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAMS, DEREK GENE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

01/21/2022: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

ANSWER FILED

02/09/2022: ANSWER FILED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

02/09/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

AFFIDAVIT FILED

02/15/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

02/21/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DISMISS

05/09/2022: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER TO DISMISS

05/09/2022: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Name: LVNV FUNDING LLC,; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: 22ND CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Entry: 1.26.22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Entry: AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: WILLIAMS, DEREK GENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE; Name: WILLIAMS, DEREK GENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: WILLIAMS, DEREK GENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: LVNV FUNDING LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUELLER, DAVID