This case was last updated from Crawford County Courts on 04/24/2022 at 02:36:33 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V DENICE KINCY

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DENICE KINCY. This case was filed in Crawford County Courts, Crawford County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-170

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

KINCY, DENICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUELLER, DAVID

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

03/29/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED FEE

03/29/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED FEE

SUMMONS SERVED

04/20/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/03/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DISMISS

10/08/2021: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER TO DISMISS

10/21/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Entry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Entry: ATTY FOR PLAINTIFF FILES MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING ENTRY OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: LVNV FUNDING LLC,; Entry: PLAINTIFF FILES AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE. DEFENDAT IS NOT IN ACTIVE MILITARY SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: LVNV FUNDING LLC,; Entry: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SERVED TO DEFENDANTS FAMILY MEMBER ON 4-8-2021 BY PROCESS SERVER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$82.50 was made on receipt 17VA114016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED FEE; Name: LVNV FUNDING LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: LVNV FUNDING LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUELLER, DAVID