This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 01/26/2022 at 15:31:09 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V BRADLEY BUNGER -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRADLEY BUNGER -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-521

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING

Defendant

BUNGER, BRADLEY STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MUELLER, DAVID

GANI, JENIFER ANN

HOMJAK, HARLEY LARKIN

HORINEK, PEGGY SUE

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

05/10/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

05/11/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

MOTION DISMISS

07/12/2021: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER TO DISMISS

07/13/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Entry: ORDER TO DISMISS SIGNED BY JUDGE SWITZER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: HOMJAK, HARLEY LARKIN; Entry: MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY ATTY HOMJAK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $82.50 was made on receipt 26HT179533.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE DISTRICT 16-17-126; Name: HOMJAK, HARLEY LARKIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: HOMJAK, HARLEY LARKIN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUELLER, DAVID