This case was last updated from White County Courts on 01/31/2023 at 04:19:25 (UTC).

LOREN GONZALES V BRITTNAY GONZALES -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 LOREN GONZALES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRITTNAY GONZALES -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HANNAH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-97

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HANNAH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALES, LOREN

Defendant

GONZALES, BRITTANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNOLLMEYER, MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

02/10/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/10/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

02/10/2022: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

03/01/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

WAIVER

03/21/2022: WAIVER

DEPOSITION

05/02/2022: DEPOSITION

DEPOSITION

05/02/2022: DEPOSITION

DECREE OF DIVORCE

05/03/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

OCSE WAGE NOTICE

12/27/2022: OCSE WAGE NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: OCSE WAGE NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: KNOLLMEYER, MICHAEL J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Name: KNOLLMEYER, MICHAEL J; Entry: Depo of Witness

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Name: KNOLLMEYER, MICHAEL J; Entry: Depo of Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: KNOLLMEYER, MICHAEL J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: KNOLLMEYER, MICHAEL J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less