This case was last updated from Benton County Courts on 05/15/2022 at 07:13:58 (UTC).

LOFTON V LOFTON -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 LOFTON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LOFTON -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in Benton County Courts, Benton County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HORWART. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-103

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HORWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOFTON, THOMAS

Defendant

LOFTON, COURTNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS SERVED

01/25/2022: SUMMONS SERVED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

04/06/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

04/07/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

04/19/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

DECREE OF DIVORCE

04/19/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

DECREE OF DIVORCE

04/19/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: CUSTODY SUPPORT INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,; Entry: PLF TO HAVE CUSTODY OF CHILD; DEF TO PAY CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF GROUNDS FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF GROUNDS FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS; Entry: COURTNEY LOFTON 1/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 04CI75984.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS; Entry: COURTNEY LOFTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS

    Read MoreRead Less