This case was last updated from Miller County Courts on 02/28/2023 at 15:15:11 (UTC).

LINKS OF TXK V SHARNEECE KEENER -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 LINKS OF TXK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHARNEECE KEENER -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Miller County Courts, Miller County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is AUTREY, WREN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-448

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Miller, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

AUTREY, WREN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE LINKS AT TEXARKANA

Defendant

KEENER, SHARNEECE SHARELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POTTER, JACOB STEM

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/13/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

EXHIBITS

09/13/2022: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

09/13/2022: EXHIBITS

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/13/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/12/2022: AMENDED COMPLAINT

EXHIBITS

10/12/2022: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

10/12/2022: EXHIBITS

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/12/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $2.50 was made on receipt 46CI47818.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: POTTER, JACOB STEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: POTTER, JACOB STEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: POTTER, JACOB STEM; Entry: Exhibit B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: POTTER, JACOB STEM; Entry: Exhibit A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED COMPLAINT; Name: POTTER, JACOB STEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 46CI47501.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: POTTER, JACOB STEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: POTTER, JACOB STEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: POTTER, JACOB STEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: POTTER, JACOB STEM; Entry: Exhibit B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: POTTER, JACOB STEM; Entry: Exhibit A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: POTTER, JACOB STEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: POTTER, JACOB STEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less