This case was last updated from Pope County Courts on 02/19/2022 at 18:53:11 (UTC).

LINDELLE FRASER V ROBERT FRASER -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 LINDELLE FRASER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROBERT FRASER -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Pope County Courts, Pope County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MCCAIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-14

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pope, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MCCAIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRASER, LINDELLE DIANE

Defendant

FRASER, ROBERT MATTHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAUGHT, JEFFERSON KLEE

Defendant Attorney

VAUGHN, BRADEN R

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/11/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $

01/11/2021: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $

SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

03/16/2021: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

ANSWER FILED

03/19/2021: ANSWER FILED

DEPOSITION

06/07/2021: DEPOSITION

AFFIDAVIT FILED

06/07/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

DECREE OF DIVORCE

06/08/2021: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED; Name: FAUGHT, JEFFERSON KLEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Name: FAUGHT, JEFFERSON KLEE; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO; Name: FAUGHT, JEFFERSON KLEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: CUSTODY SUPPORT INFORMATION; Name: FAUGHT, JEFFERSON KLEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: FAUGHT, JEFFERSON KLEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: FAUGHT, JEFFERSON KLEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Name: FAUGHT, JEFFERSON KLEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: VAUGHN, BRADEN R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: VAUGHN, BRADEN R; Entry: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR ABSOLUTE DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER; Name: FAUGHT, JEFFERSON KLEE; Entry: PROOF OF SERVICE SERVED DEFENDANT ON 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$167.50 was made on receipt 58CI232.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Entry: ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR ABSOLUTE DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    Read MoreRead Less