This case was last updated from Crawford County Courts on 01/18/2022 at 01:30:47 (UTC).

LEVI DOUILLARD V JESSICA DOUILLARD -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 LEVI DOUILLARD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JESSICA DOUILLARD -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in Crawford County Courts, Crawford County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC MCCUNE and CANDICE SETTLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-551

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judges

MARC MCCUNE

CANDICE SETTLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOUILLARD, LEVI

Defendant

DOUILLARD, JESSICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLAKE, ANDREW ALEX

Defendant Attorney

BRYANT III, GLENN EDWARD

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

12/28/2020: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

12/28/2020: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

RETURN OF SERVICE

01/05/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE

ANSWER FILED

01/12/2021: ANSWER FILED

COUNTERCLAIM

01/12/2021: COUNTERCLAIM

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

01/14/2021: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

LETTER TO COURT

02/23/2021: LETTER TO COURT

LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

02/24/2021: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

MOTION CONTINUANCE

03/26/2021: MOTION CONTINUANCE

ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

03/29/2021: ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

03/29/2021: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

LETTER TO COURT

04/02/2021: LETTER TO COURT

LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

04/09/2021: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

05/06/2021: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

05/10/2021: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

DECREE OF DIVORCE

08/02/2021: DECREE OF DIVORCE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: JUDGE CANDICE SETTLE,; Entry: SEE HRG 7/28/21; CRT CONTINUES JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: FLAKE, ANDREW ALEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: FINAL DIVORCE HEARING HELD; Entry: IN OPEN COURT BEFORE JUDGE SETTLE, C COPELAND/REPORTER, ATTY ANDREW FLAKE PRES WITH PLTF, ATTY TRAE BRYANT PRES WITH DEFT; MATTER SETTLED BEFORE CRT, NOW UNCONTESTED; SWORN TESTIMONY TAKEN; DIV GRANTED TO PLTF ON GROUNDS OF GΠ NO CHILDREN; NO REAL PROPERTY; 3 KAYAKS AWARDED TO PLTF; 3 CELL PHONES AWARDED TO PLTF, DEFT TO RETURN CELL PHONES TO ATTY BRYANTS OFFICE FOR PLTF TO PICK UP W/IN ONE WEEK; PLTF RESPONSIBLE FOR AT&T DEBT/ACCOUNT; CARE CREDIT CARD OF $3,000, PLTF RESPONSIBLE FOR DEBT/ACCOUNT; DEFT RESTORED TO NAME OF VANMATRE; PLTF PROVIDED NAME OF THOMAS HIGGONS TO DEFT THAT SOLD THE 300 MAG; ALL OTHER ITEMS ARE DIVIDED; ATTY ANDREW FLAKE TO PREPARE ORDER W/IN 10 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE; Entry: FROM M BAKER TO ATTY ANDREW FLAKE & TRAE BRYANT RE: FINAL CONTESTED HRG SET FOR 7/28/21 @1:15PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: FINAL DIVORCE HEARING SCHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: FINAL DIVORCE HEARING CANCD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE; Entry: FROM M BAKER TO ATTY ANDREW FLAKE & TRAE BRYANT RE: FINAL CONTESTED HRG SET FOR 7/29/21 @9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM; Name: FLAKE, ANDREW ALEX; Entry: FILED BY ATTY ANDREW FLAKE FOR PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COUNTERCLAIM; Name: BRYANT III, GLENN EDWARD; Entry: FOR DIVORCE, FILED BY ATTY TRAE BRYANT FOR DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: BRYANT III, GLENN EDWARD; Entry: TO COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE, FILED BY ATTY TRAE BRYANT FOR DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Name: FLAKE, ANDREW ALEX; Entry: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT TO DEFT ON 1/1/21 BY PROCESS SERVER DON LAFARLETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: TO JESSICA DOUILLARD; TO ATTY FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 17CI15740.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: FLAKE, ANDREW ALEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: FLAKE, ANDREW ALEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: FLAKE, ANDREW ALEX; Entry: RE: DIVORCE, FILED BY ATTY ANDREW FLAKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: FLAKE, ANDREW ALEX

    Read MoreRead Less