This case was last updated from White County Courts on 05/14/2022 at 11:13:03 (UTC).

LARRY JONES V MARGARET JONES

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 LARRY JONES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARGARET JONES. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HANNAH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-718

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HANNAH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES, LARRY

Defendant

JONES, MARGARET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HARSSON, COLBIE M

CHOATE, PENNY COLLINS

FALWELL, COLBIE M

Defendant Attorneys

HUDGINS, ROBERT WELTON

GLOVER, JENNIFER ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

AMENDED ORDER

01/26/2022: AMENDED ORDER

ORDER OTHER

01/21/2022: ORDER OTHER

REPORT OF SALE

01/19/2022: REPORT OF SALE

ORDER OTHER

12/17/2021: ORDER OTHER

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

11/30/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE COMMISSIONER'S SALE

11/08/2021: NOTICE COMMISSIONER'S SALE

ORDER OTHER

11/03/2021: ORDER OTHER

BRIEF IN SUPPORT

10/26/2021: BRIEF IN SUPPORT

BRIEF IN SUPPORT

10/25/2021: BRIEF IN SUPPORT

RESPONSE/REPLY

10/13/2021: RESPONSE/REPLY

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

10/12/2021: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

MOTION OTHER

10/12/2021: MOTION OTHER

DECREE OF DIVORCE

09/07/2021: DECREE OF DIVORCE

ORDER OTHER

09/07/2021: ORDER OTHER

MOTION OTHER

09/02/2021: MOTION OTHER

ORDER TO DISMISS

08/30/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

WITNESS LIST

06/30/2021: WITNESS LIST

REQUEST

06/25/2021: REQUEST

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED ORDER; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REPORT OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE COMMISSIONER'S SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: ORDER REGARDING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: BRIEF IN SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOTION HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOTION HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STANDING RESTRAINING ORDER; Entry: DR2020-8245

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Entry: ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Entry: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE/COUNTERCLAIM FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: FINAL DIVORCE HEARING SCHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOATE, PENNY COLLINS