This case was last updated from Benton County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 04:24:34 (UTC).

LANE V LANE -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 LANE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LANE -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Benton County Courts, Benton County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HORWART. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1583

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HORWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANE, JASON

Defendant

LANE, SUSAN

Not Yet Classified

MERRYMAN, BUFFIE BROOKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CROSBY, KATHERINE SHEA

Defendant Attorneys

NEWMAN, SUE ANN V

JOHNSON, BRENT ALEX

 

Court Documents

DECREE OF DIVORCE

05/18/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

DEPOSITION

05/17/2022: DEPOSITION

AFFIDAVIT FILED

05/17/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

03/24/2022: ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

MOTION CONTINUANCE

03/18/2022: MOTION CONTINUANCE

NOTICE - OTHER

02/01/2022: NOTICE - OTHER

NOTICE - OTHER

12/27/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

TEMPORARY ORDER

12/13/2021: TEMPORARY ORDER

TEMPORARY ORDER

12/13/2021: TEMPORARY ORDER

FILING - OTHER

12/12/2021: FILING - OTHER

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

12/06/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

ORDER APPOINT COUNSEL

12/02/2021: ORDER APPOINT COUNSEL

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

11/30/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

ORDER TO WITHDRAW

11/29/2021: ORDER TO WITHDRAW

MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

11/24/2021: MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

11/23/2021: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

MOTION OTHER

11/19/2021: MOTION OTHER

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

10/12/2021: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: CUSTODY SUPPORT INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,; Entry: PARTIES TO SHARE JOINT LEGAL CUSTODY OF MINOR; PLF TO PAY CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Name: CROSBY, KATHERINE SHEA; Entry: DEPOSITION UPON WRITTEN QUESTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: CROSBY, KATHERINE SHEA; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: CROSBY, KATHERINE SHEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,; Entry: HRG CONTINUED TO 5/24/22 AT 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION CONTINUANCE; Name: CROSBY, KATHERINE SHEA

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: NEWMAN, SUE ANN V

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM; Name: NEWMAN, SUE ANN V; Entry: RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE AND COUNTER COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: CROSBY, KATHERINE SHEA; Entry: SUSAN LANE 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: SUSAN LANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 04CI73303.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: CROSBY, KATHERINE SHEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: CROSBY, KATHERINE SHEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET; Name: CROSBY, KATHERINE SHEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: CROSBY, KATHERINE SHEA; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: CROSBY, KATHERINE SHEA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CROSBY, KATHERINE SHEA