This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 01/16/2023 at 09:24:19 (UTC).

LACHERYL SMITH V GERARD SMITH -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 LACHERYL SMITH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GERARD SMITH -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is GRAHAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-12

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

GRAHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SMITH, LACHERYL EVETTE

MAULS, LACHERYL EVETTE

Defendant

SMITH, GERARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

HUTCHESON, JOEL ISSAC

THOMAS, GREGORY MARTIN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

01/27/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/10/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE

02/11/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE

ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

03/03/2022: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

03/04/2022: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

06/09/2022: PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

LETTER FROM COURT

06/13/2022: LETTER FROM COURT

JUDGE NOTE

07/13/2022: JUDGE NOTE

DECREE OF DIVORCE

07/13/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

ORDER QUALIFIED DOM RELATIONS

08/11/2022: ORDER QUALIFIED DOM RELATIONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER QUALIFIED DOM RELATIONS; Name: 13TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGE NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER FROM COURT; Entry: Hrg. July 13, 2022, at 9:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Name: HUTCHESON, JOEL ISSAC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM; Name: HUTCHESON, JOEL ISSAC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM; Name: THOMAS, GREGORY MARTIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Name: HUTCHESON, JOEL ISSAC; Entry: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less