This case was last updated from White County Courts on 04/25/2022 at 09:39:22 (UTC).

KRISTAN ALEXANDER HOUSE V STEVIE CHRISTINE HOUSE -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 KRISTAN ALEXANDER HOUSE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STEVIE CHRISTINE HOUSE -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HANNAH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-579

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HANNAH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOUSE, KRISTAN ALEXANDER

Defendant

HOUSE, STEVIE CHRISTINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETTY, DENNY PAUL

Defendant Attorney

SIMPSON JR , JAMES A

 

Court Documents

DECREE OF DIVORCE

01/31/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

12/27/2021: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

ORDER TO APPEAR

12/20/2021: ORDER TO APPEAR

MOTION CITATION/CONTEMPT

12/17/2021: MOTION CITATION/CONTEMPT

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/15/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER OTHER

09/29/2021: ORDER OTHER

ORDER OTHER

09/29/2021: ORDER OTHER

MOTION OTHER

09/22/2021: MOTION OTHER

MOTION OTHER

09/22/2021: MOTION OTHER

ANSWER FILED

09/13/2021: ANSWER FILED

COUNTERCLAIM

09/09/2021: COUNTERCLAIM

ANSWER FILED

09/09/2021: ANSWER FILED

RETURN OF SERVICE

08/24/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/23/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

STANDING RESTRAINING ORDER

07/26/2021: STANDING RESTRAINING ORDER

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

07/19/2021: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/19/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

07/19/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: PETTY, DENNY PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: FINAL DIVORCE HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED; Name: PETTY, DENNY PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: FINAL DIVORCE HEARING SCHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO APPEAR; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: NO ACTION TAKEN; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: HOUSE, STEVIE CHRISTINE; Entry: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: TEMPORARY HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STANDING RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    Read MoreRead Less