This case was last updated from Benton County Arkansas Courts on 01/29/2023 at 17:17:26 (UTC).

KILLION V THOMAS -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 KILLION filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against THOMAS -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Benton County Arkansas Courts, Benton County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HORWART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1479

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HORWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KILLION, MISTY

Defendant

THOMAS, JONATHON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMSFIELD, KRISTOPHER ALAN

 

Court Documents

PET PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER

09/15/2022: PET PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER

AFFIDAVIT IN FORMA PAUPERIS

09/15/2022: AFFIDAVIT IN FORMA PAUPERIS

AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL MEANS

09/15/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL MEANS

IFP EXHIBIT NO FILE MARK

09/15/2022: IFP EXHIBIT NO FILE MARK

ORDER PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER

09/16/2022: ORDER PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER

COMPLAINT/PETITION POST IFP

09/16/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION POST IFP

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/24/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION OTHER

12/08/2022: MOTION OTHER

ORDER OTHER

12/08/2022: ORDER OTHER

WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

12/09/2022: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

RETURN OF SERVICE

01/06/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

01/10/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

01/13/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: RAMSFIELD, KRISTOPHER ALAN; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY WARNING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Entry: I, TOM BARBOUR, POSTED ON COURTHOUSE BULLETIN BOARD ON 12/9/2022 AND REMAINED POSTED UNTIL 1/10/2023. ORDER POSTED FOR 4 CONSECUTIVE WEEKS THROUGH 1/6/2023 AND REMAINED POSTED TO 1/10/2023 PER ATTY REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Entry: I, TOM BARBOUR, POSTED TO COURTHOUSE BULLETIN BOARD ON 12/9/2022 AND REMAINED POSTED UNTIL 1/6/2023 TB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK; Entry: JONATHON THOMAS; POSTED 12/9/2022 TB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,; Entry: ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO SERVE BY WARNING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Name: RAMSFIELD, KRISTOPHER ALAN; Entry: MOTION TO SERVE BY WARNING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: RAMSFIELD, KRISTOPHER ALAN; Entry: JONATHON THOMAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION POST IFP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT IN FORMA PAUPERIS; Name: RAMSFIELD, KRISTOPHER ALAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: IFP EXHIBIT NO FILE MARK; Name: RAMSFIELD, KRISTOPHER ALAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL MEANS; Name: RAMSFIELD, KRISTOPHER ALAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT IN FORMA PAUPERIS; Name: RAMSFIELD, KRISTOPHER ALAN; Entry: IFP Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER; Name: RAMSFIELD, KRISTOPHER ALAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: RAMSFIELD, KRISTOPHER ALAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less