This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 05/20/2022 at 19:15:54 (UTC).

KEVIN WHITE V SHAKENYA DOOLEY-WHITE -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 KEVIN WHITE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SHAKENYA DOOLEY-WHITE -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judges overseeing this case are HON. RICHARD N. MOORE, JR and HON. AMY D. JOHNSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3766

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judges

HON. RICHARD N. MOORE, JR

HON. AMY D. JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITE, KEVIN

Defendant

DOOLEY-WHITE, SHAKENYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

BUTLER, JOHN ANDERSON

MCKEEL, AGATHER CELESTE

 

Court Documents

OCSE WAGE NOTICE

02/01/2022: OCSE WAGE NOTICE

DECREE OF DIVORCE

01/29/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

AFFIDAVIT FILED

01/25/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR CERT

01/19/2022: TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR CERT

CERTIFICATE

01/18/2022: CERTIFICATE

BRIEF FILED

01/14/2022: BRIEF FILED

BRIEF FILED

01/14/2022: BRIEF FILED

NOTICE - OTHER

01/12/2022: NOTICE - OTHER

NOTICE - OTHER

10/04/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

OCSE WAGE NOTICE

10/04/2021: OCSE WAGE NOTICE

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

08/31/2021: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER TEMPORARY CUSTODY

08/30/2021: ORDER TEMPORARY CUSTODY

LETTER TO COURT

08/20/2021: LETTER TO COURT

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

08/03/2021: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

NOTICE - OTHER

04/15/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

01/14/2021: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

01/04/2021: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

SUMMONS SERVED

12/14/2020: SUMMONS SERVED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: OCSE WAGE NOTICE; Entry: OCSE WAGE WITHHOLDING NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: HON. AMY D. JOHNSON - 15TH DIVISION 6TH CIRCUIT,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: BUTLER, JOHN ANDERSON; Entry: Affidavit of Witness

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR CERT; Entry: KEVIN WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: JUDGE NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE; Name: MCKEEL, AGATHER CELESTE; Entry: Transparenting Course SHAKENYA DOOLEY- WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • HearingEvent: FINAL DIVORCE HEARING; Room: COURTROOM 340, 15TH DIVISION; Location: CIRCUIT; Judge: HON. AMY D. JOHNSON - 15TH DIVISION 6TH CIRCUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: BRIEF FILED; Name: MCKEEL, AGATHER CELESTE; Entry: Pre-Trial Memorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM; Name: MCKEEL, AGATHER CELESTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: BUTLER, JOHN ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 60CI415512.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: BUTLER, JOHN ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: BUTLER, JOHN ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: BUTLER, JOHN ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET; Name: BUTLER, JOHN ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: BUTLER, JOHN ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: BUTLER, JOHN ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less