This case was last updated from White County Courts on 01/21/2023 at 02:18:53 (UTC).

KEVIN HALE V RONDA HALE -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 KEVIN HALE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RONDA HALE -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HANNAH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-102

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HANNAH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HALE, KEVIN WAYNE

Defendant

HALE, RONDA LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETTY, DENNY PAUL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

02/10/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

02/10/2022: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

WAIVER

04/15/2022: WAIVER

DECREE OF DIVORCE

04/26/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: PETTY, DENNY PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: UNCONTEST DIVRCE HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: UNCONTEST DIVRCE HEARING SCHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: PETTY, DENNY PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less