This case was last updated from Crawford County Courts on 05/20/2022 at 14:36:00 (UTC).

KENDALL MURPHY V JADELYNN MURPHY -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 KENDALL MURPHY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JADELYNN MURPHY -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Crawford County Courts, Crawford County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CANDICE SETTLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-519

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

CANDICE SETTLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURPHY, KENDALL WAYNE

Defendants

MURPHY, JADELYNN LEIGH

FALDON, JADELYNN LEIGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYD, MOSEMARIE DORA

 

Court Documents

IFP EXHIBIT NO FILE MARK

11/19/2021: IFP EXHIBIT NO FILE MARK

PET PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER

11/19/2021: PET PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER

AFFIDAVIT IN FORMA PAUPERIS

11/19/2021: AFFIDAVIT IN FORMA PAUPERIS

IFP EXHIBIT NO FILE MARK

11/19/2021: IFP EXHIBIT NO FILE MARK

ORDER PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER

11/23/2021: ORDER PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER

COMPLAINT/PETITION POST IFP

11/23/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION POST IFP

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

11/23/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS SERVED

12/09/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

01/25/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

DEPOSITION

01/25/2022: DEPOSITION

DECREE OF DIVORCE

01/27/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: JUDGE CANDICE SETTLE,; Entry: DIVORCE GRANTED ON GROUNDS OF GΠ NO MINOR CHILDREN; NO REAL PROPERTY; PLTF AWARDED 2017 FIAT & 2007 JEEP LIBERTY & ITS DEBT; DEFT AWARDED HER NEW VEHICLE & ITS DEBT; PROPERTY & DEBT LAID OUT IN DECREE; DEFT NAME SHALL REMAIN UNCHANGED; CRT RETAINS JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Name: BOYD, MOSEMARIE DORA; Entry: OF DIVORCE SIGNE BY PLTF; FILED BY ATTY MOSEMARIE BOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: BOYD, MOSEMARIE DORA; Entry: AS TO RESIDENCY & SEPARATION SIGNED BY RACHEL MURPHY; FILED BY ATTY MOSEMARIE BOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: BOYD, MOSEMARIE DORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Entry: TO DEFT ON 12/7/2021 BY CCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: TO DEFT, TO ATTY FOR SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION POST IFP; Entry: FOR DIVORCE, FILED BY ATTY MOSEMARIE BOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER; Name: JUDGE CANDICE SETTLE,; Entry: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: IFP EXHIBIT NO FILE MARK; Name: BOYD, MOSEMARIE DORA; Entry: SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT IN FORMA PAUPERIS; Name: BOYD, MOSEMARIE DORA; Entry: SIGNED BY KENDALL MURPHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER; Name: BOYD, MOSEMARIE DORA; Entry: PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, FILED BY ATTY/MOSEMARIE BOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: IFP EXHIBIT NO FILE MARK; Name: BOYD, MOSEMARIE DORA; Entry: COMPLAINT, FILED BY ATTY/MOSEMARIE BOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: BOYD, MOSEMARIE DORA

    Read MoreRead Less