This case was last updated from White County Courts on 01/21/2023 at 01:18:00 (UTC).

KEITH MCNEAL V RITA DILLON -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 KEITH MCNEAL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RITA DILLON -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HANNAH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-95

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HANNAH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCNEAL, KEITH

Defendant

DILLON, RITA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

02/09/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/09/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

02/09/2022: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

02/09/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

04/18/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

RETURN OF SERVICE

04/25/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE

LETTER FROM COURT

04/25/2022: LETTER FROM COURT

DECREE OF DIVORCE

06/15/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER FROM COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less