This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 03/24/2022 at 08:05:09 (UTC).

KATHRYN JONES V WILLIAM JONES -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 KATHRYN JONES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WILLIAM JONES -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-312

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES, KATHRYN MARIE

Defendant

JONES, WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUSSEIN, CHRISTOPHER MAGDY

Defendant Attorney

SNODERLY, JORDAN L

 

Court Documents

PET PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER

03/15/2021: PET PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER

AFFIDAVIT IN FORMA PAUPERIS

03/15/2021: AFFIDAVIT IN FORMA PAUPERIS

IFP EXHIBIT NO FILE MARK

03/15/2021: IFP EXHIBIT NO FILE MARK

ORDER PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER

03/16/2021: ORDER PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER

COMPLAINT/PETITION POST IFP

03/16/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION POST IFP

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/16/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS SERVED

04/02/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

ANSWER FILED

04/28/2021: ANSWER FILED

ORDER OTHER

07/16/2021: ORDER OTHER

MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

10/04/2021: MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

10/04/2021: MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

ORDER TO DISMISS

10/04/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

ORDER TO WITHDRAW

10/04/2021: ORDER TO WITHDRAW

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO WITHDRAW; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: HUSSEIN, CHRISTOPHER MAGDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; Name: HUSSEIN, CHRISTOPHER MAGDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; Name: HUSSEIN, CHRISTOPHER MAGDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND MEDIATION TERMS 10/4/21 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: SNODERLY, JORDAN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: SNODERLY, JORDAN L; Entry: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: HUSSEIN, CHRISTOPHER MAGDY; Entry: WILLIAM JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: HUSSEIN, CHRISTOPHER MAGDY; Entry: WILLIAM JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION POST IFP; Name: HUSSEIN, CHRISTOPHER MAGDY; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: IFP EXHIBIT NO FILE MARK; Name: HUSSEIN, CHRISTOPHER MAGDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT IN FORMA PAUPERIS; Name: HUSSEIN, CHRISTOPHER MAGDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER; Name: HUSSEIN, CHRISTOPHER MAGDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: HUSSEIN, CHRISTOPHER MAGDY

    Read MoreRead Less