This case was last updated from White County Courts on 01/21/2023 at 05:42:41 (UTC).

KALEY THOMPSON V JARED THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 KALEY THOMPSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JARED THOMPSON. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HANNAH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-112

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HANNAH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMPSON, KALEY

Defendant

THOMPSON, JARED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBERTSON, BONNIE LEE

VAIL, ROBIN MILLER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

02/14/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/14/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

02/14/2022: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

RETURN OF SERVICE

03/01/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/12/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/18/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION OTHER

05/26/2022: MOTION OTHER

MOTION CONTINUANCE

05/26/2022: MOTION CONTINUANCE

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

05/27/2022: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

AFFIDAVIT FILED

09/26/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

09/26/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

DECREE OF DIVORCE

09/26/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: FINAL DIVORCE HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: ROBERTSON, BONNIE LEE; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: ROBERTSON, BONNIE LEE; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: NO ACTION TAKEN; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM; Name: ROBERTSON, BONNIE LEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION CONTINUANCE; Name: VAIL, ROBIN MILLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: FINAL DIVORCE HEARING CONTD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: ROBERTSON, BONNIE LEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Name: ROBERTSON, BONNIE LEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: FINAL DIVORCE HEARING SCHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less