This case was last updated from Boone County Arkansas Courts on 01/06/2023 at 13:13:16 (UTC).

JUDY MONTGOMERY V DAVID MONTGOMERY -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 JUDY MONTGOMERY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DAVID MONTGOMERY -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Boone County Arkansas Courts, Boone County Circuit Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is COPELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-363

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Boone, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

COPELAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONTGOMERY, JUDY KAREN

Defendant

MONTGOMERY, DAVID LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOON, PHILLIP ASHLEY

Defendant Attorney

COOPER, MARK FRANKLIN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/09/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/09/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

ANSWER FILED

09/26/2022: ANSWER FILED

LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

10/18/2022: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

TEMPORARY ORDER

11/02/2022: TEMPORARY ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

11/16/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

11/21/2022: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

ORDER MEDIATION

11/21/2022: ORDER MEDIATION

MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME

12/15/2022: MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME

ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME

12/15/2022: ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • HearingEvent: FINAL HEARING; Room: BOONE COURTROOM; Location: CIRCUIT; Judge: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: Order Granting Extension of Time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME; Name: MOON, PHILLIP ASHLEY; Entry: Motion for Extension of Time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER MEDIATION; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE; Entry: FOR APRIL 24, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: FINAL HEARING SCHEDULED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: COOPER, MARK FRANKLIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: JUDGE NOTE; Entry: PARTIES ENTERED AN AGREED ORDER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: TEMPORARY HEARING CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: TEMPORARY ORDER; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: Temporary Order Granting Plaintiff Possession of Marital Residence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE; Entry: FOR NOVEMBER 7, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: TEMPORARY HEARING SCHEDULED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: COOPER, MARK FRANKLIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: Summons - D. Montgomery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $2.50 was made on receipt 05CI4215.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MOON, PHILLIP ASHLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 05CI4214.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MOON, PHILLIP ASHLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MOON, PHILLIP ASHLEY; Entry: Verified Complaint for Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: MOON, PHILLIP ASHLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less