This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 03:27:55 (UTC).

JUDITH QUALLS -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 JUDITH QUALLS -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HEARNSBERGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-568

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HEARNSBERGER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANDERSEN, THOMAS

Claimant

ASCENSIONPOINT

Decedent

QUALLS, JUDITH L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRITTON JR, GUY BLANN

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

01/06/2022: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

12/29/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

12/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

12/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

12/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

12/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

12/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

12/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

12/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

12/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

11/01/2021: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

FILING - OTHER

10/21/2021: FILING - OTHER

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

10/21/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

10/21/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

09/13/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

08/25/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

08/25/2021: ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

ORDER AUTH EMPL OF ESTATE ATT

08/25/2021: ORDER AUTH EMPL OF ESTATE ATT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$5.00 was made on receipt 26CO3871.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Name: ASCENSIONPOINT,; Entry: CITIBANK 1223.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$5.00 was made on receipt 26CO3846.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: ASCENSION POINT $3494.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$35.00 was made on receipt 26CO3798.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: APRS SYNCHRONY BANK CITGO 730.56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: APRS SYNCHRONY BANK PHILLIPS CREDIT CARD 2 989.38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: APRS SYNCHRONY BANK LOWES VISA REWARDS 1571.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: APRS SYNCHRONY BANK SAMS CLUB 2871.74

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: APRS SYNCHRONY BANK PHILLIPS 66 CREDIT CARD 672.31

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION IV,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER AUTH EMPL OF ESTATE ATT; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION IV,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 26CO3452.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: BRITTON JR, GUY BLANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE; Name: BRITTON JR, GUY BLANN; Entry: Redacted Death Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX; Name: BRITTON JR, GUY BLANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Name: BRITTON JR, GUY BLANN; Entry: Petition for Authority to Employ Estate Attorney's and to Authorize Attorney's Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: BRITTON JR, GUY BLANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: BRITTON JR, GUY BLANN

    Read MoreRead Less