This case was last updated from Benton County Arkansas Courts on 09/08/2022 at 18:24:07 (UTC).

JOSHUA TAYLOR -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 JOSHUA TAYLOR -NON-TRIAL was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Benton County Arkansas Courts, Benton County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HORWART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-794

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HORWART

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BLAKELY, JENNIFER

Not Yet Classified

TAYLOR, JOSHUA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DUNN, TYLER JAMES

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF RIGHTS

07/21/2022: STATEMENT OF RIGHTS

PETITION CIVIL COMMITMENT

07/21/2022: PETITION CIVIL COMMITMENT

ORDER PICK UP ORDER

07/22/2022: ORDER PICK UP ORDER

ORDER MENTAL EXAMINATION

07/26/2022: ORDER MENTAL EXAMINATION

ORDER INVOLUNTARY COMMITMENT

08/02/2022: ORDER INVOLUNTARY COMMITMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER INVOLUNTARY COMMITMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: DUNN, TYLER JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER MENTAL EXAMINATION; Entry: 7 DAY EVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER PICK UP ORDER; Entry: IMMEDIATE DETENTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: DUNN, TYLER JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION CIVIL COMMITMENT; Name: DUNN, TYLER JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RIGHTS; Name: DUNN, TYLER JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: DUNN, TYLER JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNN, TYLER JAMES