This case was last updated from Crawford County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 09:59:58 (UTC).

JOSEPH KOLLER V REBECCA KOLLER -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 JOSEPH KOLLER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against REBECCA KOLLER -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Crawford County Courts, Crawford County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC R. MCCUNE DIV 1 and CANDICE SETTLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-414

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judges

MARC R. MCCUNE DIV 1

CANDICE SETTLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOLLER, JOSEPH GREGORY

Defendant

KOLLER, REBECCA DAWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEAN, DAVID CHARLES

Defendant Attorney

BRANNON, REBECCA DAWN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/23/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

MOTION TEMPORARY RELIEF

09/23/2021: MOTION TEMPORARY RELIEF

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/23/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

01/12/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

01/21/2022: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

ANSWER FILED

01/21/2022: ANSWER FILED

RESPONSE/REPLY

01/24/2022: RESPONSE/REPLY

LETTER TO COURT

02/02/2022: LETTER TO COURT

ORDER RECUSAL

03/28/2022: ORDER RECUSAL

LETTER TO COURT

05/05/2022: LETTER TO COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER TO COURT; Name: GEAN, DAVID CHARLES; Entry: FROM: ATTY/DAVID GEAN RE: REQUEST FOR HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: CLERK NOTE; Entry: DUE TO JDG SETTLE'S RECUSAL THE COMPUTER ASSIGNED THE CASE TO JDG MCCUNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER RECUSAL; Entry: OF DIV III, CLERK SHALL REASSIGN THE CASE IN ACCORDANCE W/ADMIN ORDER 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER TO COURT; Name: GEAN, DAVID CHARLES; Entry: FROM: ATTY/DAVID GEAN RE: REQUEST TO SET HRG FOR MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY; Name: GEAN, DAVID CHARLES; Entry: TO COUNTER-CLAIM FOR DIVORCE, FILED BY ATTY/DAVID GEAN FOR PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: BRANNON, REBECCA DAWN; Entry: TO MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF, FILED BY ATTY/REBECCA BRANNON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: BRANNON, REBECCA DAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM; Name: BRANNON, REBECCA DAWN; Entry: FILED BY ATTY/REBECCA BRANNON ON BEHALF OF DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: GEAN, DAVID CHARLES; Entry: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT & MOTION TO REBECCA KOLLER ON 12/31/21 BY PROCESS SERVER/CARLOS MORENO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: TO DEFT, TO ATTY FOR SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 17CI16893.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: GEAN, DAVID CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: GEAN, DAVID CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION TEMPORARY RELIEF; Name: GEAN, DAVID CHARLES; Entry: FILED BY ATTY/DAVID GEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET; Name: GEAN, DAVID CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: GEAN, DAVID CHARLES; Entry: FILED BY ATTY/DAVID GEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: GEAN, DAVID CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less