This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 05/12/2022 at 13:14:20 (UTC).

JOHNY MAURICIO AYALA -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 JOHNY MAURICIO AYALA -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-520

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MARTIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AYALA, JOSE

Claimant

WASHINGTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

Decedent

AYALA, JOHNY MAURICIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEVIN, S RICHARD

Other Attorneys

COZART, ANDREW CARTER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

06/08/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

06/08/2021: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

DEATH CERTIFICATE

06/08/2021: DEATH CERTIFICATE

ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

06/09/2021: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

AMENDED PETITION

06/14/2021: AMENDED PETITION

AMENDED ORDER

06/15/2021: AMENDED ORDER

ACCEPT APPOINTMENT

06/16/2021: ACCEPT APPOINTMENT

NOTICE - OTHER

06/16/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

06/16/2021: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

06/30/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE AFF CLAIM AGAINST ESTAT

07/13/2021: NOTICE AFF CLAIM AGAINST ESTAT

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

09/07/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

11/05/2021: PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

11/12/2021: ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

FILING - OTHER

12/03/2021: FILING - OTHER

RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

12/13/2021: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: LEVIN, S RICHARD; Entry: Receipt of Payment for WRMC Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP; Name: LEVIN, S RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $5.00 was made on receipt 72CO4018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING ADD PARTIES; Name: COZART, ANDREW CARTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE AFF CLAIM AGAINST ESTAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: LEVIN, S RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPOINTMENT; Name: LEVIN, S RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED ORDER; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED PETITION; Name: LEVIN, S RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 72CO3653.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: LEVIN, S RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE; Name: LEVIN, S RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Name: LEVIN, S RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: LEVIN, S RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: LEVIN, S RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less