This case was last updated from Crawford County Arkansas Courts on 07/25/2022 at 08:10:07 (UTC).

JOHN HORTON V TROY SHARRAH ETAL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 JOHN HORTON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TROY SHARRAH ETAL -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Crawford County Arkansas Courts, Crawford County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MARC R. MCCUNE DIV 1. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-560

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MARC R. MCCUNE DIV 1

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HORTON, JOHN QUINCY

Defendants

SHARRAH, TROY

AULTMAN, ALLEN

A1 AUTO SALES & SALVAGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KETCHAM, MATTHEW JOHN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

11/19/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

11/19/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

11/19/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS SERVED

11/29/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

SUMMONS SERVED

11/29/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

ANSWER FILED

12/16/2021: ANSWER FILED

ANSWER FILED

12/16/2021: ANSWER FILED

AMENDED ANSWER

12/20/2021: AMENDED ANSWER

ANSWER FILED

02/09/2022: ANSWER FILED

ANSWER FILED

02/09/2022: ANSWER FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Entry: BY DEFT TROY SHARRAH PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Entry: BY DEFT ALLEN AULTMAN PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED ANSWER; Entry: TO PLTFS COMPLAINT, FILED BY TROY SHARRAH PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Entry: TO SUMMONS FILED BY DEFT TROY SHARRAH PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Entry: FILED BY DEFT ALLEN AULTMAN PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: KETCHAM, MATTHEW JOHN; Entry: TO TROY SHARRAH ON 11/22/21 BY PROCESS SERVER/MICHAEL HARDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: KETCHAM, MATTHEW JOHN; Entry: TO ALLEN AULTMAN BY SERVING LINDA VALENCIA ON 11/22/21 BY PROCESS SERVER/MICHAEL HARDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: TO ALLEN AULTMAN, TO ATTY FOR SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: TO TROY SHARRAH, TO ATTY FOR SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $170.00 was made on receipt 17CI17193.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: KETCHAM, MATTHEW JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: KETCHAM, MATTHEW JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: KETCHAM, MATTHEW JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: KETCHAM, MATTHEW JOHN; Entry: FILED BY ATTY MATTHEW KETCHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: KETCHAM, MATTHEW JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less