This case was last updated from Miller County Courts on 02/11/2022 at 13:13:43 (UTC).

JENNY SANDERS V COREY SANDERS

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 JENNY SANDERS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COREY SANDERS. This case was filed in Miller County Courts, Miller County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-254

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Miller, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANDERS, JENNY RENEE

MORRIS, JENNY RENEE

Defendant

SANDERS, COREY URENLL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

06/14/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED FEE

06/14/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED FEE

SUMMONS SERVED

06/18/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

08/27/2021: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

DECREE OF DIVORCE

09/16/2021: DECREE OF DIVORCE

FILING - OTHER

09/22/2021: FILING - OTHER

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: JUDGE NOTE - COURT 9/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE; Entry: 9-16-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$167.50 was made on receipt 46CI41682.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less