This case was last updated from Craighead County Courts on 07/05/2022 at 07:13:49 (UTC).

JENNIFER MAI V LONG CHAU -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 JENNIFER MAI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LONG CHAU -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Craighead County Courts, Craighead County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is THYER, C G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2-41

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Craighead, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

THYER, C G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAI, JENNIFER

Defendant

CHAU, LONG H

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

AFFIDAVIT FILED

01/21/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

WAIVER

01/21/2022: WAIVER

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

01/21/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

AMENDED PETITION

03/29/2022: AMENDED PETITION

FILING - OTHER

03/29/2022: FILING - OTHER

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

03/29/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

WAIVER

03/30/2022: WAIVER

DECREE OF DIVORCE

04/04/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED PETITION; Entry: AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$2.50 was made on receipt 16ZS16085.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$165.00 was made on receipt 16ZS16083.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENT WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    Read MoreRead Less