This case was last updated from White County Courts on 01/28/2022 at 01:40:49 (UTC).

JENNA BOWLS V CHRISTOPHER BOWLS

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 JENNA BOWLS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER BOWLS. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HANNAH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-527

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HANNAH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOWLS, JENNA

Defendant

BOWLS, CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MERCER, JUSTIN GABRIEL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

06/23/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/23/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/28/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION DISMISS

07/29/2021: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER TO DISMISS

08/02/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: TEMPORARY HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: TEMPORARY HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    Read MoreRead Less