This case was last updated from Benton County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 15:39:17 (UTC).

JEFFERY MANNING CINGOLANI -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 JEFFERY MANNING CINGOLANI -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Benton County Courts, Benton County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-526

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLOWER, MISTY CINGOLANI

Decedent

CINGOLANI, JEFFERY MANNING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DRAKE, MARK DWAIN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

05/25/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

05/26/2021: ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

ACCEPT APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

05/26/2021: ACCEPT APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

05/26/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

05/26/2021: PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

05/27/2021: ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

06/01/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

06/10/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

01/03/2022: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

01/25/2022: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

01/25/2022: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

01/26/2022: PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

ORDER CLOSING ESTATE

01/27/2022: ORDER CLOSING ESTATE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER CLOSING ESTATE; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: DRAKE, MARK DWAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB; Name: DRAKE, MARK DWAIN; Entry: Petition for Approval of Final Distribution and for Discharge of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING; Name: DRAKE, MARK DWAIN; Entry: and Entry of Appearance - JOSEPH CINGOLANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING; Name: DRAKE, MARK DWAIN; Entry: and Entry of Appearance - ROBIN CINGOLANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; Entry: RELEASE OF CLAIM - TAX COLLECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: DRAKE, MARK DWAIN; Entry: Affidavit of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: BENTON COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP; Name: DRAKE, MARK DWAIN; Entry: Petition for Authority to Sell Personal Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX; Name: DRAKE, MARK DWAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX; Entry: ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATRIX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 04CO7366.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: DRAKE, MARK DWAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: DRAKE, MARK DWAIN; Entry: Petition for Appointment of Administrator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: DRAKE, MARK DWAIN

    Read MoreRead Less