This case was last updated from Boone County Arkansas Courts on 12/29/2022 at 23:41:15 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS V TIFFANY LARUE -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TIFFANY LARUE -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Boone County Arkansas Courts, Boone County Circuit Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is COPELAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-261

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Boone, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

COPELAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendant

LARUE, TIFFANY D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOB, MICHAEL A

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/09/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/09/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/03/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

11/08/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

11/30/2022: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A; Entry: Disposition Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: NO ACTION TAKEN; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: The Court does not sign Orders with blank signature lines. Must state, "see attached signature page" on the signature line.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A; Entry: Disposition Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A; Entry: Disposition Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A; Entry: Motion for Judgment and Damages by Deafault

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 05CI4338.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less