This case was last updated from White County Courts on 01/21/2023 at 06:40:23 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS V PATRICIA MCDONALD

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PATRICIA MCDONALD. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BROCK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-127

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BROCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS

Defendant

MCDONALD, PATRICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOB, MICHAEL A

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

02/15/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/15/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

04/01/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

05/05/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

EXHIBITS

05/12/2022: EXHIBITS

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

05/18/2022: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A; Entry: Disposition Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A; Entry: Motion for Judgment and Damages by Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A; Entry: Motion for Judgment and Damages by Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less