This case was last updated from Miller County Courts on 03/13/2022 at 15:40:05 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS V BOBBY SCOTT -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BOBBY SCOTT -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Miller County Courts, Miller County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-231

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miller, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendants

SCOTT, BOBBY RAY,JR

SCOTT, BOBBY RAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOB, MICHAEL A

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

06/16/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

06/16/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

MOTION DISMISS

10/11/2021: MOTION DISMISS

JUDGMENT-DISMISS W/O PREJUDICE

10/18/2021: JUDGMENT-DISMISS W/O PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DISMISS W/O PREJUDICE; Name: EIGHT SOUTH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 46CI42233.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    Read MoreRead Less