This case was last updated from Benton County Arkansas Courts on 02/28/2023 at 18:28:26 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC V HARGER -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HARGER -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Benton County Arkansas Courts, Benton County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, JOHN R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2391

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, JOHN R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendant

HARGER, DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOB, MICHAEL A

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/15/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/16/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

ORDER OTHER

02/06/2023: ORDER OTHER

ORDER TO DISMISS

02/06/2023: ORDER TO DISMISS

MOTION DISMISS

02/07/2023: MOTION DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: RULE 4I

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: NOTICE OF 4I DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 04CI83548.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: DANIEL HARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: JACOB, MICHAEL A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less