This case was last updated from Craighead County Courts on 08/09/2022 at 14:10:51 (UTC).

JANET BLYTHE V DENNIS JONES JR -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 JANET BLYTHE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DENNIS JONES JR -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Craighead County Courts, Craighead County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2-31

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Craighead, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLYTHE, JANET BLYTHE

Defendant

JONES, DENNIS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/19/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

01/19/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

01/31/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

DECREE OF DIVORCE

03/01/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$167.50 was made on receipt 16ZS16062.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    Read MoreRead Less