This case was last updated from Van Buren County Courts on 12/12/2021 at 04:20:41 (UTC).

JAMMIE L BENSON V RONALD J BENSON JR -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 JAMMIE L BENSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RONALD J BENSON JR -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Van Buren County Courts, Van Buren County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CLARK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-145

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Van Buren, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

CLARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENSON, JAMMIE LYNN

Defendants

BENSON, RONALD JAY,JR

BENSON, RONALD JAY

BENSON, RONALD

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

12/02/2020: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

12/02/2020: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

DEPOSITION

12/02/2020: DEPOSITION

DEPOSITION

12/02/2020: DEPOSITION

LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

12/17/2020: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

DECREE OF DIVORCE

01/13/2021: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: UNCONTEST DIVRCE HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Entry: DISPOSITION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Entry: DECREE OF DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: UNCONTEST DIVRCE HEARING SCHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE; Entry: setting sheet - 1/13/21 at 9:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Entry: DEPOSITION OF WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Entry: DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$165.00 was made on receipt 71CI3131.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER; Entry: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND WAIVER OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Entry: COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less