This case was last updated from Benton County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 01:57:22 (UTC).

JAMES WAYNE TALMAN -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 JAMES WAYNE TALMAN -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Benton County Courts, Benton County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HORWART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-999

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HORWART

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TZINBERG, SCOTT

Claimant

ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY, DANIEL NAGAN

Decedent

TALMAN, JAMES WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GREEN, HUNTER BRYCE GLENN

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

12/28/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

12/15/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

11/08/2021: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

11/02/2021: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

REPORT OF SALE

11/01/2021: REPORT OF SALE

ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

10/20/2021: ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

10/20/2021: PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

10/18/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

10/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

DEMAND FOR NOTICE

10/04/2021: DEMAND FOR NOTICE

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

10/01/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

10/01/2021: ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

09/30/2021: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

09/30/2021: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

WAIVER

09/30/2021: WAIVER

WAIVER

09/30/2021: WAIVER

WAIVER OF BOND

09/30/2021: WAIVER OF BOND

WAIVER OF BOND

09/30/2021: WAIVER OF BOND

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$5.00 was made on receipt 04CO8457.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: CLAIM VS ESTATE - ASCENSIONPOINT (CITIBANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$5.00 was made on receipt 04CO8408.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: CLAIM VS ESTATE - ASCENSIONPOINT (4826.13)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; Entry: RECEIPT AND RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REPORT OF SALE; Name: GREEN, HUNTER BRYCE GLENN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP; Name: GREEN, HUNTER BRYCE GLENN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: GREEN, HUNTER BRYCE GLENN

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: GREEN, HUNTER BRYCE GLENN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING; Name: GREEN, HUNTER BRYCE GLENN; Entry: WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING (SENNETT TZINBERG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING; Name: GREEN, HUNTER BRYCE GLENN; Entry: WAIVER OF INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING (ERIC SOLIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: GREEN, HUNTER BRYCE GLENN; Entry: WAIVER OF NOTICE (SENNETT TZINBERG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: GREEN, HUNTER BRYCE GLENN; Entry: WAIVER OF NOTICE (ERIC SOLIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER OF BOND; Name: GREEN, HUNTER BRYCE GLENN; Entry: WAIVER OF BOND (SENNETT TZINBERG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER OF BOND; Name: GREEN, HUNTER BRYCE GLENN; Entry: WAIVER OF BOND (ERIC SOLIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE; Name: GREEN, HUNTER BRYCE GLENN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: GREEN, HUNTER BRYCE GLENN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: GREEN, HUNTER BRYCE GLENN

    Read MoreRead Less