This case was last updated from Faulkner County Courts on 04/30/2022 at 14:49:24 (UTC).

JAMES HAMILTON -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 JAMES HAMILTON -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Faulkner County Courts, Faulkner County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CLARK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-130

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Faulkner, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

CLARK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HAMILTON, ERIC

Claimants

FORTE

WINBOURNE, JAY

Decedent

HAMILTON, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PARKER, BROOKLYN RAE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

03/03/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

EXHIBITS

03/03/2021: EXHIBITS

ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

03/04/2021: ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

NOTICE APPT ADMINISTRATOR/TRIX

03/10/2021: NOTICE APPT ADMINISTRATOR/TRIX

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

03/10/2021: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

ACCEPT APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

03/10/2021: ACCEPT APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

FILING - OTHER

03/29/2021: FILING - OTHER

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

06/23/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

06/23/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

07/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

FILING - OTHER

10/19/2021: FILING - OTHER

FILING - OTHER

10/19/2021: FILING - OTHER

FILING - OTHER

10/19/2021: FILING - OTHER

WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

10/22/2021: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

PETITION

10/22/2021: PETITION

EXHIBITS

10/22/2021: EXHIBITS

ORDER OTHER

10/22/2021: ORDER OTHER

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 20TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: PARKER, BROOKLYN RAE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Name: PARKER, BROOKLYN RAE; Entry: Petition for Authority to Make Final Distribution of Estate Assets and For Administrator Executing Deed for Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING; Name: PARKER, BROOKLYN RAE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: PARKER, BROOKLYN RAE; Entry: Release of Creditor's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: PARKER, BROOKLYN RAE; Entry: Release of Creditor's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$5.00 was made on receipt 23CO3372.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: PARKER, BROOKLYN RAE; Entry: Statement of Legal Advertising

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX; Name: PARKER, BROOKLYN RAE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE APPT ADMINISTRATOR/TRIX; Name: PARKER, BROOKLYN RAE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX; Name: 20TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 23CO3089.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: PARKER, BROOKLYN RAE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: PARKER, BROOKLYN RAE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: PARKER, BROOKLYN RAE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: PARKER, BROOKLYN RAE

    Read MoreRead Less