This case was last updated from Miller County Courts on 04/27/2022 at 05:24:03 (UTC).

IRWIN BERNSTEIN V SHIRLEY BOBIAN -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 IRWIN BERNSTEIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHIRLEY BOBIAN -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Miller County Courts, Miller County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HALTOM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-174

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Miller, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HALTOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IRWIN BERSTEIN, AS LIQUIDATING TRUSTEE FOR JH CX LIQUIDATING

Defendant

BOBIAN, SHIRLEY

Garnishee

REHKOPF ENTERPRISES, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERDUE, ADAM F

Defendant Attorney

SQUYRES, AARON LEE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

05/11/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

05/12/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

08/18/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

08/31/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

08/31/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

AMENDED MOTION

09/22/2021: AMENDED MOTION

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

10/15/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

INTERROGATORIES

01/25/2022: INTERROGATORIES

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

01/25/2022: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $20.00 was made on receipt 46CI44947.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Name: SQUYRES, AARON LEE; Entry: Rehkopf Enterprises, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: INTERROGATORIES; Name: SQUYRES, AARON LEE; Entry: Rehkopf Enterprises, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: EIGHT SOUTH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED MOTION; Name: SQUYRES, AARON LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: SQUYRES, AARON LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE; Name: SQUYRES, AARON LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: PERDUE, ADAM F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 46CI41823.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: PERDUE, ADAM F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: PERDUE, ADAM F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: PERDUE, ADAM F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: PERDUE, ADAM F

    Read MoreRead Less