This case was last updated from Crawford County Arkansas Courts on 08/21/2022 at 05:34:34 (UTC).

IRVIN BERNSTEIN V JASON MCDOWELL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 IRVIN BERNSTEIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JASON MCDOWELL -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Crawford County Arkansas Courts, Crawford County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MARC R. MCCUNE DIV 1. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-554

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MARC R. MCCUNE DIV 1

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IRWIN BERSTEIN

AS LIQUIDATING TRUSTEE FOR JH MET SUBSIDIARY B LIQUIDATING T

Defendant

MCDOWELL, JASON GREGORY

Garnishee

MERCY HOSPITAL FORT SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SQUYRES, AARON LEE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

11/18/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

11/18/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

12/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

01/06/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

01/07/2022: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

INTERROGATORIES

02/18/2022: INTERROGATORIES

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

02/18/2022: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

03/14/2022: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $20.00 was made on receipt 17CI17699.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Entry: MERCY, SIGNED BY N. HODGES/MERCY PAYROLL SHARED SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Name: SQUYRES, AARON LEE; Entry: TO MERCY HOSPITAL FORT SMITH, TO ATTY FOR SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: INTERROGATORIES; Name: SQUYRES, AARON LEE; Entry: FILED BY ATTY AARON SQUYRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N JUDGMENT TO PLTF $6,183.64 PLUS COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: JUDGE MARC R. MCCUNE DIV 1,; Entry: PLTF TO RECOVER FROM DEFT THE SUM OF $6,183.64 PLUS COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: SQUYRES, AARON LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: SQUYRES, AARON LEE; Entry: FILED BY ATTY AARON SQUYRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 17CI17356.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: SQUYRES, AARON LEE; Entry: SUMMONS TO JASON MCDOWELL BY SERVING JILL MCDOWELL ON 11/26/21 BY PROCESS SERVER/LARA ASPEDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: TO DEFT, TO ATTY FOR SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: SQUYRES, AARON LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: SQUYRES, AARON LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: SQUYRES, AARON LEE; Entry: FILED BY ATTY AARON SQUYRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: SQUYRES, AARON LEE

    Read MoreRead Less