This case was last updated from Miller County Courts on 02/28/2023 at 13:07:55 (UTC).

IN RE: VANESSA GABRIELLE ROSADO

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 IN RE VANESSA GABRIELLE ROSADO was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Miller County Courts, Miller County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is AUTREY, WREN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-439

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miller, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

AUTREY, WREN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROSADO, VANESSA GABRIELLE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/12/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

FILING - OTHER

09/19/2022: FILING - OTHER

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/22/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

FILING - OTHER

10/06/2022: FILING - OTHER

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/31/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/07/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE

11/22/2022: MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE

FILING - OTHER

12/20/2022: FILING - OTHER

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE RE: MOVING COURT DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Entry: RESET: 1-5-23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Entry: 12-8-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: JUDGES NOTES 10-6-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Entry: 10-6-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: REPORT FROM BI STATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$165.00 was made on receipt 46CI47463.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less