This case was last updated from Crittenden County Courts on 05/25/2022 at 05:57:34 (UTC).

HOPE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION V KIERA SHARTON BEASON

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 HOPE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KIERA SHARTON BEASON. This case was filed in Crittenden County Courts, Crittenden County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELLINGTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-551

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Crittenden, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

ELLINGTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOPE CREDIT UNION

Defendant

BEASON, KIERA SHARTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRISHAM, AUDRIANNA

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED

09/13/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/13/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/13/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

11/19/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/10/2021: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-SUMMARY

04/13/2022: JUDGMENT-SUMMARY

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: GRISHAM, AUDRIANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Name: GRISHAM, AUDRIANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: GRISHAM, AUDRIANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: BEASON, KIERA SHARTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less