This case was last updated from Baxter County Courts on 01/28/2022 at 00:40:55 (UTC).

HOLLIE DOUCET V MITCHELL DOUCET -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 HOLLIE DOUCET filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MITCHELL DOUCET -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Baxter County Courts, Baxter County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BAILEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-200

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Baxter, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOUCET, HOLLIE LUCAS

Defendant

DOUCET, MITCHELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REED, EMILY C

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

06/22/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/22/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

06/22/2021: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

06/23/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

07/23/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

AFFIDAVIT FILED

07/23/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

DEPOSITION

07/23/2021: DEPOSITION

DECREE OF DIVORCE

07/26/2021: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: REED, EMILY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: DECREE OF ABSOLUTE DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Name: REED, EMILY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: REED, EMILY C; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER; Name: REED, EMILY C; Entry: MITCHELL DOUCET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: REED, EMILY C; Entry: MITCHELL DOUCET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 03CI5630.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: REED, EMILY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: REED, EMILY C; Entry: MITCHELL DOUCET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: REED, EMILY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET; Name: REED, EMILY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: REED, EMILY C; Entry: PETITION FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: REED, EMILY C

    Read MoreRead Less