This case was last updated from Greene County Courts on 01/22/2022 at 18:16:26 (UTC).

HITT CONSTRUCTION, LCC VS JR & SHAY WYATT

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 HITT CONSTRUCTION, LCC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JR SHAY WYATT. This case was filed in Greene County Courts, Greene County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-344

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Greene, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HITT CONSTRUCTION, LLC

Defendants

WYATT, SHAT

WYATT, JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

HITT, CURTIS WAYNE

LYONS, JIM

HUERKAMP, DALTON OWEN

 

Court Documents

ANSWER FILED

01/14/2022: ANSWER FILED

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

01/13/2022: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/13/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

01/13/2022: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

AMENDED COMPLAINT

01/10/2022: AMENDED COMPLAINT

RESPONSE/REPLY

01/03/2022: RESPONSE/REPLY

RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

01/03/2022: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

12/29/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST

12/28/2021: REQUEST

RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

12/28/2021: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

12/27/2021: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

MOTION DISMISS

12/17/2021: MOTION DISMISS

ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

12/17/2021: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

SUMMONS SERVED

11/24/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

SUMMONS SERVED

11/24/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

11/23/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

11/23/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

COMPLAINT/PETITION POST IFP

11/23/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION POST IFP

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: HITT, CURTIS WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM; Name: HITT, CURTIS WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Name: LYONS, JIM; Entry: Requests for Admission to Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM; Name: LYONS, JIM; Entry: Answer to Amended Complaint and Counterclaim Subject to the Motion to Dismiss Filed Herein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED COMPLAINT; Name: HITT, CURTIS WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REQUEST; Name: HITT, CURTIS WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: LYONS, JIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: LYONS, JIM; Entry: Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM; Name: LYONS, JIM; Entry: Answer and Counterclaim Subject to the Motion to Dismiss Filed Herein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: HITT, CURTIS WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: HITT, CURTIS WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION POST IFP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less