This case was last updated from Benton County Courts on 05/25/2022 at 03:18:48 (UTC).

HERRON V HERRON ETAL -JURY TRIAL

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 HERRON filed an Other lawsuit against HERRON ETAL -JURY TRIAL. This case was filed in Benton County Courts, Benton County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHRANTZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1991

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SCHRANTZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERRON, MELVIN

Defendants

ELITE TITLE COMPANY INC

HERRON, HEATHER

CORNERSTONE BANK

HERRON, JASON

LIKE-KIND EXCHANGE, LLC

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LUCAS, MARK CARLTON

Defendant Attorneys

BENTLEY, PAYTON C

WILLIAMS, JAY BARTON

CLARK, SUZANNE G.

MCNULTY, KELLY WAYNE

CURRY, ANDREW T

BERGER, ERIC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

05/04/2022: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

04/06/2022: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

02/21/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ANSWER FILED

01/18/2022: ANSWER FILED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

01/04/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

ANSWER FILED

01/03/2022: ANSWER FILED

ANSWER FILED

01/03/2022: ANSWER FILED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

12/15/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

12/15/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

EXHIBITS

12/14/2021: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

12/14/2021: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

12/14/2021: EXHIBITS

AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/14/2021: AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER OTHER

12/07/2021: ORDER OTHER

JUDGE NOTE

11/29/2021: JUDGE NOTE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

11/22/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

MOTION QUASH

11/01/2021: MOTION QUASH

RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

10/28/2021: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER; Entry: JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER; FIVE DAY JURY TRIAL ON APRIL 3-7, 2023 AT 9:00AM; PRETRIAL ON 03/27/2023 AT 1:15PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED; Entry: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE 5/3/2022 @ 115 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: BENTLEY, PAYTON C; Entry: CHANCE COMBS 1/10/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: BERGER, ERIC; Entry: SEPARATE ANSWER OF FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY TO PLFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $2.50 was made on receipt 04CI75581.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: CHANCE COMBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: CLARK, SUZANNE G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: CLARK, SUZANNE G.; Entry: SEP DEFS ELITE TITLE CO INC & LIKE KIND EXCHANGE LLC, ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT & 3RD PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST CHANGE COMBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: CURRY, ANDREW T; Entry: ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: LIKE KIND EXCHANGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: LARRY VANCUREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: HEATHER HERRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $175.00 was made on receipt 04CI72121.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: LUCAS, MARK CARLTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: LUCAS, MARK CARLTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: LUCAS, MARK CARLTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: LUCAS, MARK CARLTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: LUCAS, MARK CARLTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: LUCAS, MARK CARLTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: LUCAS, MARK CARLTON

    Read MoreRead Less