This case was last updated from Crittenden County Courts on 04/22/2022 at 05:46:55 (UTC).

HERBERT POINTER V SAVANNAH SCOTT

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 HERBERT POINTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SAVANNAH SCOTT. This case was filed in Crittenden County Courts, Crittenden County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is THYER, C R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-90

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Crittenden, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

THYER, C R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POINTER, HERBERT

Defendant

SCOTT, SAVANNAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GATES, JOSEPH DEAN

Defendant Attorneys

DRENNON, BAXTER D

HORNUNG, NICHOLAS DANIEL

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED

02/05/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/05/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS SERVED

04/12/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

04/12/2021: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

ANSWER FILED

04/19/2021: ANSWER FILED

NOTICE REMOVED FEDERAL COURT

04/23/2021: NOTICE REMOVED FEDERAL COURT

NOTICE - OTHER

10/29/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: DRENNON, BAXTER D; Entry: Notice of Change of Firm and Contact Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE REMOVED FEDERAL COURT; Name: DRENNON, BAXTER D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: DRENNON, BAXTER D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: NO ACTION TAKEN; Name: 2ND CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,; Entry: Motion to Extend is not yet ripe. If there is an issue with service, Plaintiff is directed to file supplemental motion prior to 5/25 and the Court will reconsider at that time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME; Name: GATES, JOSEPH DEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: GATES, JOSEPH DEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: GATES, JOSEPH DEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: SCOTT, SAVANNAH; Entry: SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DEF. AND RETURNED TO ATTY OF RECORD FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less