This case was last updated from Crittenden County Courts on 06/24/2022 at 09:26:27 (UTC).

HALE RENTALS LLC V JOHN JEFFERSON ETAL

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 HALE RENTALS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOHN JEFFERSON ETAL. This case was filed in Crittenden County Courts, Crittenden County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELLINGTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-134

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Crittenden, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

ELLINGTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HALE RENTALS LLC

Defendants

JEFFERSON, JESSICA

JEFFERSON, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUMPTER, DENNY

Defendant Attorney

SUMPTER, II ROGRE DENNIS "DENNY"

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED

03/09/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/09/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/09/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE - OTHER

03/09/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

SUMMONS SERVED

03/10/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

SUMMONS SERVED

03/10/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

FILING - OTHER

03/16/2021: FILING - OTHER

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/16/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

03/16/2021: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

SUMMONS SERVED

03/23/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

FILING - OTHER

03/24/2021: FILING - OTHER

MOTION OTHER

04/23/2021: MOTION OTHER

NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

04/28/2021: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

CONSENT ORDER

05/25/2021: CONSENT ORDER

MOTION DISMISS

12/01/2021: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER TO DISMISS

12/06/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Entry: Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CONSENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Name: SUMPTER, II ROGRE DENNIS "DENNY"; Entry: MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT, WILLIAM HALE'S, ANSWER TO THE DEFENDANTS' AND COUNTER PLAINTIFFS' THIRD PART COMPLAINT (FAX)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Entry: SUMMONS RETURN (SERVED WILLIAM HALE 3/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM; Name: SUMPTER, II ROGRE DENNIS "DENNY"; Entry: BY HALE RENTALS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: SUMMONS ISSUED FOR WILLIAM HALE AND RETURNED TO ATTY OF RECORD FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: DEFENDANTS, JOHN JEFFERSON AND JESSICA JEFFERSON'S ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND WRITTEN OBJECTION TO THE NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION AND JOHN JEFFERSON'S COUNTERCLAIM AGAINST HALE RENTALS, LLC AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST WILLIAM HALE, INDIVIDUALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: JEFFERSON, JOHN; Entry: 03/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: JEFFERSON, JESSICA; Entry: BY LEAVING A COPY WITH JOHN JEFFERSON 3/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: JEFFERSON, JESSICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: JEFFERSON, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less