This case was last updated from Benton County Arkansas Courts on 01/29/2023 at 17:17:53 (UTC).

GUERRA V STOCKWELL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 GUERRA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STOCKWELL -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Benton County Arkansas Courts, Benton County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HORWART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1485

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HORWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUERRA, JOSEPH MARIA

Defendant

STOCKWELL, RICKY LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VERNETTI, BRYAN STEVE

Defendant Attorney

BAILEY, DAVID ALLEN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/15/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/15/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS SERVED

09/19/2022: SUMMONS SERVED

ANSWER FILED

09/29/2022: ANSWER FILED

NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

10/11/2022: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

MOTION CONTINUANCE

01/09/2023: MOTION CONTINUANCE

ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

01/10/2023: ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,; Entry: CASE CONTINUED TO 3/16/2023 @ 9 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION CONTINUANCE; Name: VERNETTI, BRYAN STEVE; Entry: JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED; Entry: FINAL HEARING 1/12/23 @ 9 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: BAILEY, DAVID ALLEN; Entry: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: VERNETTI, BRYAN STEVE; Entry: RICKY LEE STOCKWELL 9/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 04CI82447.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: VERNETTI, BRYAN STEVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: VERNETTI, BRYAN STEVE; Entry: RICKY LEE STOCKWELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: VERNETTI, BRYAN STEVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: VERNETTI, BRYAN STEVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: VERNETTI, BRYAN STEVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less