This case was last updated from Faulkner County Courts on 05/14/2022 at 01:32:34 (UTC).

GUARANTEED AUTO SALES LLC V CASEY DAWN FAYANN YOST

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 GUARANTEED AUTO SALES LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CASEY DAWN FAYANN YOST. This case was filed in Faulkner County Courts, Faulkner County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-444

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Faulkner, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUARANTEED AUTO SALES LLC

Defendant

YOST, CASEY DAWN FAYANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRISHAM, AUDRIANNA

 

Court Documents

SHOW CAUSE HEARING CANCELLED

04/26/2022: SHOW CAUSE HEARING CANCELLED

SHOW CAUSE HEARING SCHED

01/28/2022: SHOW CAUSE HEARING SCHED

MOTION ORDER CONTEMPT

01/26/2022: MOTION ORDER CONTEMPT

APPEAL TRANSCRIPT/CERT COPY

11/23/2021: APPEAL TRANSCRIPT/CERT COPY

JUDGMENT-SUMMARY

11/03/2021: JUDGMENT-SUMMARY

MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/01/2021: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SERVICE (IN STATE)

08/27/2021: SERVICE (IN STATE)

TRIAL SCHEDULED

08/24/2021: TRIAL SCHEDULED

MOTION CONTINUANCE

08/24/2021: MOTION CONTINUANCE

WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

08/06/2021: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

AFFIDAVIT FILED

08/06/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

NOTICE SENT

07/06/2021: NOTICE SENT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/01/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

AMENDED COMPLAINT

06/01/2021: AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME

05/28/2021: ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME

MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

05/21/2021: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

05/21/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

TRIAL SCHEDULED

04/28/2021: TRIAL SCHEDULED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SHOW CAUSE HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SHOW CAUSE HEARING SCHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION ORDER CONTEMPT; Name: GUARANTEED AUTO SALES LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt 23CW71862.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: APPEAL TRANSCRIPT/CERT COPY; Name: GUARANTEED AUTO SALES LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-SUMMARY; Name: GUARANTEED AUTO SALES LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Name: GUARANTEED AUTO SALES LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$12.55 was made on receipt 23CW70995.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - CERT MAIL/REST DELIV; Name: GUARANTEED AUTO SALES LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE; Name: GRISHAM, AUDRIANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL CANCELLED; Entry: ATTY REQ. CASE OFF DOCKET PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - CERT MAIL/REST DELIV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SC COMPLAINT FILED $65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: DATE CLAIM AROSE

    Read MoreRead Less