This case was last updated from Benton County Arkansas Courts on 01/29/2023 at 17:17:14 (UTC).

GARCIA V GARCIA -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 GARCIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GARCIA -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in Benton County Arkansas Courts, Benton County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HORWART. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1477

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HORWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA, ALBERTO

Defendant

GARCIA, CATHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHMUTZLER, TARA ANN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/15/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/15/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

11/25/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

12/02/2022: PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

AFFIDAVIT FILED

12/05/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

12/05/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

12/05/2022: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

AFFIDAVIT FILED

12/05/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

12/05/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

DECREE OF DIVORCE

12/05/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Entry: PLFS AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: SCHMUTZLER, TARA ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: SCHMUTZLER, TARA ANN; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: SCHMUTZLER, TARA ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER; Name: SCHMUTZLER, TARA ANN; Entry: PRO SE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 04CI82411.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: SCHMUTZLER, TARA ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: SCHMUTZLER, TARA ANN; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: SCHMUTZLER, TARA ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less